NY S03141 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-30 - returned to senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the mobile and manufactured home replacement program to eliminate older mobile and manufactured homes and replace them with new manufactured, modular or site-built homes; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes the mobile and manufactured home replacement program to eliminate older mobile and manufactured homes and replace them with new manufactured, modular or site-built homes; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. John Mannion [D] | Sen. Michelle Hinchey [D] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Rachel May [D] |
Sen. Robert Rolison [R] | Sen. Lea Webb [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-09 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Senate - Senate Housing, Construction and Community Development Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.187 |
2024-05-30 | Assembly | substituted for a9158a |
2024-05-13 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2024-05-13 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-03-20 | Senate | AMENDED ON THIRD READING 3141A |
2024-01-31 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-01-30 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-01-29 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.269 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2023-06-07 | Assembly | referred to housing |
2023-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-05-30 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2023-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2023-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1275 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-01-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO HOUSING, CONSTRUCTION AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09158 (Same As) 2024-05-30 - substituted by s3141a