NY S04246 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "packaging reduction and recycling infrastructure act" to require companies selling, offering for sale, or distributing packaging materials and products to register with a packaging reduction organization to develop a packaging reduction and recycling plan.
Title
Enacts the "packaging reduction and recycling infrastructure act" to require companies selling, offering for sale, or distributing packaging materials and products to register with a packaging reduction organization to develop a packaging reduction and recycling plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Environmental Conservation Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2024-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1882 |
2024-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2024-06-04 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4246D |
2024-06-04 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-06-03 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4246C |
2024-06-03 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2024-02-27 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2024-02-09 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4246B |
2024-02-09 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2024-01-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2023-06-01 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 4246A |
2023-06-01 | Senate | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO FINANCE |
2023-03-15 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2023-02-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A05322 (Same As) 2024-06-06 - ordered to third reading rules cal.482