NY S05855 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.228
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of the department of transportation, to conduct a study on the environmental and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Title
Directs the department of environmental conservation, with the assistance of the department of transportation, to conduct a study on the environmental and human health impacts of John F. Kennedy international airport and LaGuardia airport.
Sponsors
Sen. James Gaughran [D] | Sen. Joseph Addabbo [D] | Sen. John Brooks [D] | Sen. Todd Kaminsky [D] |
Sen. Anna Kaplan [D] | Sen. John Liu [D] | Sen. Kevin Thomas [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 16 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-13 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.228 |
2019-12-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.628 |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted for a7710 |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2019-06-06 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-06 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1221 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2019-05-15 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07710 (Same As) 2019-12-13 - VETOED MEMO.228