NY S06987 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9035
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends provisions of law relating to installment loans.
Title
Extends provisions of law relating to installment loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9035 |
2014-05-19 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-14 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.745 |
2014-04-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
A09035 (Same As) 2014-07-22 - signed chap.111