NY S07212 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9348
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes technical changes relating to removing the requirement that an application for membership in the New York State and Local Employees' Retirement System or the New York State and Local Police and Fire Retirement System be notarized (acknowledged).
Title
Makes technical changes relating to removing the requirement that an application for membership in the New York State and Local Employees' Retirement System or the New York State and Local Police and Fire Retirement System be notarized (acknowledged).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9348 |
2016-05-25 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2016-05-24 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1048 |
2016-04-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A09348 (Same As) 2016-07-21 - signed chap.123