NY S08251 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-28 - VETOED MEMO.185
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to eliminating the electronic death registration system fee for funeral directors and undertakers.
Title
Relates to eliminating the electronic death registration system fee for funeral directors and undertakers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-05-10 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Health Committee Vote (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-28 | Senate | VETOED MEMO.185 |
2022-12-16 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.417 |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | substituted for a9231 |
2022-05-18 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
2022-05-18 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2022-05-10 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1224 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2022-02-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
Same As/Similar To
A09231 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - substituted by s8251