NY S08776 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9458B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-04 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9458B
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the discretionary spending threshold for regional off-track betting corporations to $35,000.
Title
Increases the discretionary spending threshold for regional off-track betting corporations to $35,000.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-04 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9458B |
2024-05-16 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-05-16 | Senate | AMENDED (T) 8776A |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.1128 |
2024-03-11 | Senate | REFERRED TO RACING, GAMING AND WAGERING |
Same As/Similar To
A09458 (Same As) 2024-06-04 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY