NY S08788 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8788B
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-21 - PRINT NUMBER 8788B
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Suspends proceedings to recover real property statewide until after January 20, 2021; stays the execution of warrants of eviction or judgments of possession until after January 20, 2021.
Title
Suspends proceedings to recover real property statewide until after January 20, 2021; stays the execution of warrants of eviction or judgments of possession until after January 20, 2021.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-21 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8788B |
2020-08-21 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-20 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 8788A |
2020-07-20 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO RULES |
2020-07-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A10848 (Same As) 2020-09-09 - print number 10848b