NY S09021 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9407A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9407A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supplemental spousal liability insurance coverage for the spouse of an insured who has indicated that such insured has a spouse on the insurance application.
Title
Provides supplemental spousal liability insurance coverage for the spouse of an insured who has indicated that such insured has a spouse on the insurance application.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED BY A9407A |
2024-04-17 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2024-04-16 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.801 |
2024-04-13 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 9021A |
2024-04-13 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO INSURANCE |
2024-04-10 | Senate | REFERRED TO INSURANCE |
Same As/Similar To
A09407 (Same As) 2024-09-27 - signed chap.356