NY S09847 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-07 - referred to codes
Pending: Assembly Codes Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Restricts the performance of surgical devocalization procedures on dogs and cats.
Title
Restricts the performance of surgical devocalization procedures on dogs and cats.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-07 | Assembly | referred to codes |
2024-06-07 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-06-06 | Senate | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1880 |
2024-06-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
Same As/Similar To
A03569 (Same As) 2024-07-15 - enacting clause stricken