OK HB1030 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 27 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-27 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; adding home invasion to minimum mandatory prison requirement; providing definition. Effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; adding home invasion to minimum mandatory prison requirement; providing definition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 79 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-27 | Died in conference | |
2009-05-11 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-05-07 | HC's named: Wright (John), Duncan, Jordan, Nelson, Inman, Lamons | |
2009-04-29 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-21 | SA's received | |
2009-04-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 | |
2009-04-20 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-04-02 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-27 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2009-03-19 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-16 | First Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-12 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 4 | |
2009-03-12 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-12 | Amended | |
2009-03-12 | General Order | |
2009-02-05 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-05 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Wright (John) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 13 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1443 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |