OK HB1229 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1229
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Funeral Services Licensing Act; definition; exception; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Funeral Services Licensing Act; definition; exception; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2022-03-01 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Smith |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1229 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Rules