OK HB1229 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1229
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Paxton
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Paxton
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Farmed Cervidae Act; Department of Agriculture, Food and Forestry; inspection authority; license fee; rule promulgation authority; emergency.
Title
Agriculture; Farmed Cervidae Act; Department of Agriculture, Food and Forestry; inspection authority; license fee; rule promulgation authority; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Agriculture & Rural Affairs: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Paxton |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Standridge |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stanley |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Woods |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dahm |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Alvord |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Kidd |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rogers |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Green |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4 |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Emergency added |
2023-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1229 (Carry Over) 2023-04-20 - Coauthored by Senator Paxton