OK HB1568 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1568
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; authorizing Department of Commerce to enter into negotiations; prescribing standards for contract; notification to the Tax Commission; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; tax credits; authorizing Department of Commerce to enter into negotiations; prescribing standards for contract; notification to the Tax Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-08 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-08 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 6 |
2017-03-07 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Echols |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1568 (Carry Over) 2017-03-20 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations