OK HB1929 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1929
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Pocket veto 06/12/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 26 2023 - 75% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Pocket veto 06/12/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Successful Adulthood Act; age limit; services; effective date.
Title
Children; Successful Adulthood Act; age limit; services; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Andy Fugate [D] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Rep. Ajay Pittman [D] | Sen. Kay Floyd [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 86 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Pocket veto 06/12/2023 |
2023-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pittman |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 7 |
2023-05-25 | House | CCR adopted |
2023-05-22 | House | Title restored |
2023-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Rosino, Haste, Prieto, Pemberton, Hall, Hicks |
2023-05-18 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules |
2023-05-17 | House | Naming of conferees rescinded |
2023-05-15 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules |
2023-05-09 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2023-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Floyd |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4 |
2023-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill |
2023-03-14 | House | General Order |
2023-02-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2023-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1929 (Carry Over) 2023-05-26 - Pocket veto 06/12/2023