OK HB1930 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1930
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; adoption; amount; effective date.
Title
Children; adoption; amount; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Rep. Ty Burns [R] | Rep. Denise Hader [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Approved by Governor 05/05/2023 |
2023-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-03-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Burns (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill, CrosswhiteHader |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1930 (Carry Over) 2023-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2023