OK HB2258 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Enrolled on May 25 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - Sent to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Contractors; requiring contractors show proofs of certain documentation; requiring specified agencies to share information and investigative and enforcement efforts; providing for creation of secure database; codification; effective date.
Title
Contractors; requiring contractors show proofs of certain documentation; requiring specified agencies to share information and investigative and enforcement efforts; providing for creation of secure database; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Burrage [D] | Sen. Harry Coates [R] | Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Sen. Al McAffrey [D] | Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Seneca Scott [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-05-10 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Judiciary: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-25 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-25 | CCR read | |
2012-05-25 | To Senate | |
2012-05-25 | Motion to reconsider tabled | |
2012-05-25 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | |
2012-05-25 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott | |
2012-05-25 | CCR adopted | |
2012-05-18 | CCR submitted | |
2012-05-01 | Conference granted, SCs named Burrage, Newberry, Coates, Ballenger, Brinkley, Ford | |
2012-04-25 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA | |
2012-04-19 | SA's received | |
2012-04-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-18 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-18 | coauthored by Newberry, Ivester | |
2012-04-18 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-04-03 | coauthored by Coates, McAffrey | |
2012-04-03 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin | |
2012-03-13 | General Order | |
2012-02-29 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2012-02-29 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Representative Sherrer | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |