OK HB2330 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2330
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Certificates of need; repealing Psychiatric and Chemical Dependency Facility Certificate of Need Act; emergency.
Title
Certificates of need; repealing Psychiatric and Chemical Dependency Facility Certificate of Need Act; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 35 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-04 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 35 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2024-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | House | Approved by Governor 05/06/2024 |
2024-05-02 | House | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2024-05-02 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2024-05-01 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-01 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2 |
2024-05-01 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2024-04-23 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Emergency added |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2024-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 3; Ayes: 35 Nays: 42 |
2024-03-04 | House | Emergency added |
2024-03-04 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-04 | House | General Order |
2024-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2330 (Carry Over) 2023-02-07 - Second Reading referred to Rules