OK HB2451 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2451
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Coauthored by Representative Pae
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-13 - Coauthored by Representative Pae
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; qualified employer child care expense; definitions; carryover; fiscal year cap; child care workers; income tax credit; refundability; sunset; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax credit; qualified employer child care expense; definitions; carryover; fiscal year cap; child care workers; income tax credit; refundability; sunset; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Suzanne Schreiber [D] | Sen. John Montgomery [R] | Rep. Meloyde Blancett [D] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] |
Rep. Trish Ranson [D] | Rep. Ellyn Hefner [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ranson, Hefner |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Blancett |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-20 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Schreiber |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2451 (Carry Over) 2023-04-13 - Coauthored by Representative Pae