OK HB2456 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2456
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; Employment Security Act of 1980; rate reduction; increasing penalties; removing expenditure limit; effective date.
Title
Labor; Employment Security Act of 1980; rate reduction; increasing penalties; removing expenditure limit; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 06/07/2023 |
2023-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2023-05-24 | Senate | CCR read |
2023-05-24 | House | To Senate |
2023-05-24 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 2 |
2023-05-24 | House | CCR adopted |
2023-05-22 | House | Title restored |
2023-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Paxton, McCortney, Daniels, Kidd, Haste, Rader |
2023-05-18 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules |
2023-05-17 | House | Naming of conferees rescinded |
2023-05-15 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Rules |
2023-05-08 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2023-05-01 | House | SA's received |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-04-27 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-03-21 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-21 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2023-03-20 | House | Amended |
2023-03-20 | House | House Rule suspended |
2023-03-20 | House | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-20 | House | General Order |
2023-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2456 (Carry Over) 2023-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/07/2023