OK HB2777 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2777
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Coauthored by Senator Jett
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-05 - Coauthored by Senator Jett
Pending: Senate Retirement and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Oklahoma Public Finance Protection Act; terms; standard of care; non-pecuniary factors; authority; shares; Attorney General; codification; effective date.
Title
Public finance; Oklahoma Public Finance Protection Act; terms; standard of care; non-pecuniary factors; authority; shares; Attorney General; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. Mark Lepak [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Rep. Cody Maynard [R] | Rep. Brad Boles [R] | Sen. Shane Jett [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Jett |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2023-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 12 |
2023-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Maynard, Sims |
2023-03-21 | House | General Order |
2023-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lepak, Boles |
2023-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2777 (Carry Over) 2023-03-30 - Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance