OK HB2862 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-01 - CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; illumination; multifamily dwelling units; standard; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; illumination; multifamily dwelling units; standard; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tammy West [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2018-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2018-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative West (Tammy) |
2018-02-05 | House | First Reading |