OK HB3093 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-09 - Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance; motor vehicle policies; traffic record; rates; cancellation; renewal; first claim; hearing; effective date.
Title
Insurance; motor vehicle policies; traffic record; rates; cancellation; renewal; first claim; hearing; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Retirement & Insurance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2024-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-12 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2024-03-12 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner, Fugate |
2024-03-12 | House | General Order |
2024-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Pemberton (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Tedford |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |