OK HB3198 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-04 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public lands; Commissioners of Land Office; removing harmful woody species; providing for program funding; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public lands; Commissioners of Land Office; removing harmful woody species; providing for program funding; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - Senate - Senate: Energy & Telecommunications: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - House - House: Agriculture Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Patzkowsky |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Murdock |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano |
2024-03-06 | House | General Order |
2024-02-21 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-21 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton, Caldwell (Trey), Dobrinski, Talley, Pae, Lowe (Dick), Pfeiffer, Ranson |
2024-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture |
2024-02-05 | House | Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Worthen |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Newton |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |