OK HB3531 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-26 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Early Childhood Task Force; membership; honorary chair; reports; compensation; reimbursement; expenses; Open Records Act; Open Meetings Act; advice; vision statement; principles; tasks; codification; effective date.
Title
Children; Early Childhood Task Force; membership; honorary chair; reports; compensation; reimbursement; expenses; Open Records Act; Open Meetings Act; advice; vision statement; principles; tasks; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Trish Ranson [D] | Sen. Julia Kirt [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-26 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: R DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: R DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee: R DO PASS (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-26 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Human Services Subcommittee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Ranson |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |