OK HB3622 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-04-08 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development; creating the Oklahoma Enterprise Task Force; membership; organization; duties; emergency.
Title
Economic development; creating the Oklahoma Enterprise Task Force; membership; organization; duties; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] | Rep. Ken Luttrell [R] | Rep. Dell Kerbs [R] |
Rep. Jim Grego [R] | Rep. Stan May [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Tammy Townley [R] |
Rep. Mike Dobrinski [R] | Rep. Josh Cantrell [R] | Rep. Nick Archer [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2024-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 6 |
2024-03-07 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2024-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kerbs, Cantrell, Townley, Archer, Grego, Pae, Luttrell, Dobrinski, May |
2024-03-07 | House | General Order |
2024-02-28 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2024-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2024-02-05 | House | Authored by Representative Hill |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading |