OK SB1055 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1055
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-23 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; definition of public health emergency; requirements for a public body to conduct meetings utilizing electronic means; quorum requirements; public availability. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Open Meeting Act; definition of public health emergency; requirements for a public body to conduct meetings utilizing electronic means; quorum requirements; public availability. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Kidd [R] | Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Rep. Amanda Swope [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2024-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on General Government |
2024-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Kidd, Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, Floyd |
2024-04-30 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Swope |
2024-04-18 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-17 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1 |
2024-04-17 | House | General Order |
2024-04-09 | House | Emergency removed |
2024-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kidd |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB1055 (Carry Over) 2023-03-29 - Second Reading referred to General Government