OK SB1447 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-05 - Approved by Governor 06/05/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Economic development; creating the Creating Oklahoma's Modern Plan for Economic Transformation and Effectiveness (COMPETE) Act; creating the Division on Economic Development, Growth, and Expansion. Emergency.
Title
Economic development; creating the Creating Oklahoma's Modern Plan for Economic Transformation and Effectiveness (COMPETE) Act; creating the Division on Economic Development, Growth, and Expansion. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-30 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-30 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 52 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 18 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/05/2024 |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2024-05-30 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2024-05-30 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2024-05-30 | House | To Senate |
2024-05-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 38; Ayes: 68 Nays: 15 |
2024-05-30 | House | CCR adopted |
2024-05-29 | House | CCR submitted |
2024-05-29 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8 |
2024-05-29 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2024-05-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2024-05-28 | Senate | CCR read |
2024-05-16 | House | Conference granted, naming GCCA |
2024-04-30 | Senate | SCs named Thompson (Kristen), Coleman, Pugh, Haste, Weaver, Seifried, Young |
2024-04-30 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Swope |
2024-04-29 | Senate | HAs read |
2024-04-29 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-04-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4 |
2024-04-25 | House | General Order |
2024-04-18 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2024-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 |
2024-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | First Reading |