OK SB1483 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
State Treasurer; modifying duties and payment procedures; creating Oklahoma Local Government Investment Pool Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
State Treasurer; modifying duties and payment procedures; creating Oklahoma Local Government Investment Pool Act. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clark Jolley [R] | Rep. Earl Sears [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 3 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-14 | First Reading | |
2012-03-14 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-13 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-13 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-13 | General Order, Considered | |
2012-02-27 | coauthored by Sears (principal House author) | |
2012-02-27 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-27 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-07 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |