OK SB16 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
County officers salaries; making certain salary increases optional.
Title
County officers salaries; making certain salary increases optional.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-28 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 55 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Approved by Governor 04/04/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-29 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-03-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-03-28 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0; Ayes: 55 Nays: 30 | |
2011-03-28 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dank | |
2011-03-28 | General Order | |
2011-03-23 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | |
2011-03-08 | coauthored by Johnson (Constance) | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-01 | coauthored by Shannon (principal House author) | |
2011-03-01 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
19 | 180 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
19 | 180 | 75 | New Code | See Bill Text |