OK SB1759 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Approved by Governor 06/10/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; requiring taxpayer transparency web site to contain information on stimulus fund expenditures. Emergency.
Title
Public finance; requiring taxpayer transparency web site to contain information on stimulus fund expenditures. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Clifford Aldridge [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Jason Murphey [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Sue Tibbs [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Approved by Governor 06/10/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-28 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-28 | HAs adopted | |
2010-04-20 | HAs read | |
2010-04-20 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-04-19 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-19 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2010-04-19 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Tibbs, Kern | |
2010-04-19 | General Order | |
2010-03-23 | Title restored | |
2010-03-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2010-03-02 | First Reading | |
2010-03-02 | Engrossed to House | |
2010-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2010-03-01 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-03-01 | coauthored by Jolley, Aldridge, Ivester | |
2010-03-01 | General Order, Considered | |
2010-02-15 | coauthored by Murphey (principal House author) | |
2010-02-15 | Title stricken | |
2010-02-15 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2010-02-12 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Murphey | |
2010-02-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2010-02-02 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2010-02-01 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2010-02-01 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
62 | 34 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 85 | 33B | New Code | See Bill Text |