OK SB1935 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-08 - Approved by Governor 05/08/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicle registration; requiring cotton module vehicles to be registered and providing for license plate. Emergency.
Title
Motor vehicle registration; requiring cotton module vehicles to be registered and providing for license plate. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-10 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Natural Resources &: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-08 | Approved by Governor 05/08/2012 | |
2012-05-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2012-05-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2012-05-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2012-05-02 | HAs adopted | |
2012-04-25 | HAs read | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 14 | |
2012-04-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Walker | |
2012-04-24 | General Order | |
2012-04-12 | Emergency added | |
2012-04-12 | Title restored | |
2012-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2012-03-19 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2012-03-05 | First Reading | |
2012-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-03-01 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-01 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | |
2012-03-01 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2012-03-01 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2012-03-01 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-02-23 | coauthored by DeWitt (principal House author) | |
2012-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2012-02-23 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2012-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2012-02-06 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2012-02-06 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1134 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |