OK SB249 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB249
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Drug courts; establishing drug court funds; establishing procedures for expenditures of certain funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Drug courts; establishing drug court funds; establishing procedures for expenditures of certain funds. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: E DO PASS (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: E DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: E DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-25 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB249 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee