OK SB307 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB307
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-04 - Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; providing that sales are subject to certain taxes; creating certain fund; clarifying and modifying direction of monies. Emergency.
Title
Medical marijuana; providing that sales are subject to certain taxes; creating certain fund; clarifying and modifying direction of monies. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 20 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: RECONSIDER (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 14 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from Rules, Direct to Calendar |
2019-03-25 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-03-18 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, considered and deferred |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Backed up to General Order |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Daniels |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure failed: Ayes: 20 Nays: 23 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Daniels |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB307 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Second Reading referred to Rules