OK SB468 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB468
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State Banking Commissioner; making a voting member of certain commissions; authorizing certain meetings; relating to the Securities Commission; modifying references. Emergency.
Title
State Banking Commissioner; making a voting member of certain commissions; authorizing certain meetings; relating to the Securities Commission; modifying references. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/01/2017 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 6 |
2017-04-24 | House | General Order |
2017-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Select Agencies sub-committee |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appr/Sub-Select Agencies |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB468 (Carry Over) 2017-05-01 - Approved by Governor 05/01/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
14A | 6 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |
14A | 6 | 504 | New Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 1 | 601 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 840 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |