OK SB617 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB617
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Venue; clarifying proper venue for actions against limited liability companies. Effective date.
Title
Venue; clarifying proper venue for actions against limited liability companies. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITHOUT EMER (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: VETO OVERRIDE NO EMERGENCY (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Senate - Senate: VETO OVERRIDE NO EMERGENCY (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-05-26 | House | To Senate |
2023-05-26 | House | Veto overridden: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2023-05-25 | House | Veto override message received |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Vetoed 04/26/2023 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-19 | House | General Order |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to Rules |
2023-04-10 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil |
2023-02-15 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Paxton |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB617 (Carry Over) 2023-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State