OK SB814 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - Conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Tattooing; mandating administrative fine and penalties for violations. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Tattooing; mandating administrative fine and penalties for violations. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | Senate | Conferees unable to agree |
2013-05-07 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-05-07 | Senate | SCs named Anderson, Newberry, Branan, Barrington, Garrison, Ellis |
2013-05-06 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2013-04-16 | Senate | coauthored by Pittman |
2013-04-09 | Senate | HAs read |
2013-04-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1 |
2013-04-08 | House | General Order |
2013-03-28 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2013-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-03-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 11 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-02-07 | Senate | coauthored by Enns (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Anderson |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 842 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 842 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 842 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |