OK SCR8 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR8
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-9)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 42-9)
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution designating April 15th as Purple Up! For Military Kids Day in Oklahoma; and thanking military families.
Title
Resolution designating April 15th as Purple Up! For Military Kids Day in Oklahoma; and thanking military families.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-19 | House | Adopted, returned to Senate |
2021-04-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark |
2021-04-19 | House | Considered |
2021-04-15 | House | Introduced |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Adopted, referred for engrossment |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Coauthored by all other Senators |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Direct to Calendar |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Pae |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Authored by Senator Pederson |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SCR8 (Carry Over) 2021-04-20 - Filed with Secretary of State