OR HB2033 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 27, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 27, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes State Department of Agriculture to deputize veterinary technicians to assist department in carrying out its duties. Authorizes State Department of Agriculture to deputize veterinary technicians to assist department in carrying out its duties.
Title
Relating to deputy state veterinary technicians.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-09 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 27, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-05-17 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-05-12 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-11 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 1--Boquist; Excused, 4--Burdick, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-09 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hudson. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 12--Alonso Leon, Bonham, Clem, Dexter, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Nearman, Ruiz, Smith G, Wallan, Zika. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |