OR HB2139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Revenue to calculate net federal itemized deduction ratio averaged over five consecutive biennia ending June 30, 2011. Directs department, for each biennium, to state percentage that, when multiplied by aggregate net federal itemized deductions that all personal income taxpayers would otherwise be entitled to claim, department projects to result in unchanged net federal itemized deduction ratio for biennium. Provides that itemized deductions otherwise allowed to personal income taxpayer shall be reduced by calculated multiplier. Applies to biennia beginning on or after July 1, 2015, and to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2016. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to use of federal itemized deductions; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Revenue. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2139 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2139/Introduced |