OR HB2465 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 716, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 716, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies requirements related to school enrollment that person under 18 years of age must meet before being issued driving privileges. Eliminates moped-restricted driver license. Eliminates requirement that out-of-state applicant for motorcycle endorsement who already has motorcycle endorsement issued by another state take motorcycle knowledge test in Oregon. Authorizes Department of Transportation to establish change of address requirements for driver license, driver permit and identification card by rule. For purposes of per-mile road usage charge, makes issuance by Department of Transportation of emblem of exemption from motor vehicle fuel taxes permissive, removes exception to requirement that seller collect use fuel taxes on motor vehicle paying per-mile road usage charge and removes requirement that Department of Transportation round metered use of subject vehicle up to next whole mile. Exempts certain persons from requirement to pay weight-mile or fuel taxes. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transportation; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill. Refer to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill. Refer to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-13 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 716, (2015 Laws): Effective date October 5, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill.Ayes, 60. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Olsen, Shields. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-04-17 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hack. Passed.Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Clem, McLane; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Gallegos. |
2015-04-16 | House | Second reading. |
2015-04-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-04-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |