OR HB2522 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 717, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 717, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Consumer and Business Services to develop, no later than September 15, 2016, recommendations to Legislative Assembly for creation of premium assistance program to enable low-income individuals residing in Oregon under Compact of Free Association to purchase health insurance through health insurance exchange. Creates Islander Health Coverage Gap Assessment Office in Oregon Health Authority to promote access to health care for island citizens residing in United States under Compact of Free Association. Appropriates moneys.] Sunsets January 2, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care for Pacific Islanders legally residing in the United States under a Compact of Free Association treaty; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Clem [D] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Rep. Paul Evans [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] |
Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 717, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Bates. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed.Ayes, 55; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 3--McLane, Smith, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-06-30 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2015-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-24 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-24 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-02-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Health Care with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |