OR HB2575 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 532, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 532, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Justice to establish program for awarding grants to law enforcement agencies and local governments for training of groups and agencies that interact with persons who have experienced trauma. Directs Department of Justice to establish program for awarding grants to law enforcement agencies and local governments for training of groups and agencies that interact with persons who have experienced trauma. Sunsets program January 1, 2024. Directs department to develop model training program that takes into account effects of trauma and that has objective of minimizing further trauma. Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training, in consultation with Department of Justice, to develop best practices for law enforcement agencies when interacting with persons who have experienced trauma that take into account effects of trauma and that have objective of minimizing further trauma. Requires law enforcement agencies to adopt appropriate best practice policies by date specified by Department of Public Safety Standards and Training. Directs Department of Public Safety Standards and Training to regularly review and update training consistent with Department of Justice model training program for police officers in training academy. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Justice for purpose of awarding training grants] implementing grant program and developing model training program and best practices. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to interactions with persons who have experienced trauma; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 532, (2021 Laws): Effective date September 25, 2021. |
2021-07-19 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 26; Nays, 2--Boquist, Robinson; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Marsh. Passed. Ayes, 48; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 10--Bynum, Drazan, Gomberg, Leif, McLain, Nosse, Rayfield, Sanchez, Smith Warner, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-04-08 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2021-04-08 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-17 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-03-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-15 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Equitable Policing. |
2021-03-03 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-01-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |