OR HB2621 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 721, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 721, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes City of Portland to operate fixed photo radar on urban high crash corridors. Sunsets January 2, 2024. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to photo radar; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] | Sen. Rod Monroe [D] | Sen. Diane Rosenbaum [D] | Sen. Chris Gorsek [D] |
Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation, with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-17 - House - House Committee Without recommendation, with amendments, be printed engrossed and be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 721, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-03 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Shields. Passed.Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Baertschiger Jr, Beyer, Boquist, Edwards, Ferrioli, Girod, Hansell, Knopp, Kruse, Thatcher, Thomsen, Whitsett; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-30 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed.Ayes, 31; Nays, 24--Barreto, Bentz, Buehler, Clem, Davis, Esquivel, Evans, Gilliam, Hack, Hayden, Heard, Huffman, Johnson, Kennemer, Nearman, Olson, Parrish, Post, Sprenger, Stark, Weidner, Whisnant, Whitsett, Wilson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 3--McLane, Smith, Speaker Kotek. |
2015-06-30 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-29 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-26 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-25 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction. |
2015-06-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-06-08 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2015-04-27 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-27 | House | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-16 | House | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. |
2015-01-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |