OR HB2870 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 726, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chapter 726, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to implement process to resolve student complaints against schools operating in state. Grants Higher Education Coordinating Commission authority to enter into contracts with certain independent nonprofit post-secondary institutions of education in order to review and act on complaints filed against institution. Permits commission to adopt rules governing resolution of complaints filed against institution.] Establishes components of process that commission may adopt. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to higher education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-26 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended and be printed engrossed (Y: 20 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - House - House Committee Do pass as amended, be printed engrossed, and bill be referred to Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | House | Chapter 726, (2015 Laws): Effective date July 20, 2015. |
2015-07-20 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-07-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-06-29 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2015-06-26 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed.Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Weidner. |
2015-06-26 | House | Second reading. |
2015-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2015-06-23 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-06-19 | House | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-05-21 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-05-06 | House | Assigned to Subcommittee On Education. |
2015-04-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. |
2015-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-04-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2015-03-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-11 | House | Referred to Higher Education, Innovation, and Workforce Development. |
2015-02-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |