OR HB2932 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes State Police Patrol Fund, separate and distinct from General Fund. Redirects state share of Oregon Liquor Control Commission Account surplus money distribution to State Police Patrol Fund. Continuously appropriates State Police Patrol Fund moneys for establishing, maintaining and meeting certain needs of state police patrol stations. Limits State Police Patrol Fund to amount necessary to maintain patrol officer staffing levels near national average. Distributes excess State Police Patrol Fund moneys to cities and counties. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to Department of State Police funding; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Esquivel [R] | Rep. Andy Olson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-03-31 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary with subsequent referral to Ways and Means. |
2015-02-06 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/HB2932 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/HB2932/Introduced |