OR HB2936 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to tax treatment of waste materials; prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to tax treatment of waste materials; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Boone [D] | Rep. Bruce Hanna [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Michael Schaufler [D] |
Rep. Gregory Smith [R] | Rep. Sherrie Sprenger [R] | Rep. Jim Thompson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | In committee upon adjournment. | |
2011-04-28 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-18 | Referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. | |
2011-04-18 | Without recommendation as to passage, with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Tax Credits by prior reference. | |
2011-04-13 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-23 | Work Session held. | |
2011-02-18 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-21 | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources with subsequent referral to Tax Credits. | |
2011-01-11 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |