OR HB2970 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 366, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 366, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "device" for purposes of practice of advanced nonablative esthetics. Defines "device" for purposes of practice of advanced nonablative esthetics. Prohibits use of device not registered with United States Food and Drug Administration. Defines "mechanical or electrical apparatus, appliance or device" for purposes of esthetics. Provides that Board of Certified Advanced Estheticians is subject to oversight by Health Licensing Office. Specifies evidence of education that applicant for residential care facility administrator license must provide to Health Licensing Office. Allows nonprofit charitable corporation that provides dental services to individuals 65 years of age and older and individuals unable to stand or walk unassisted to own, operate, conduct or maintain dental practice, clinic or office. Sunsets January 1, 2023. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 366, (2021 Laws): Effective date June 23, 2021. |
2021-06-23 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Nearman. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Thatcher, granted unanimous consent to change vote to aye. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 20; Nays, 9--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-15 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 2--Breese-Iverson, Levy; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Power, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-04-14 | House | Carried over to April 15, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | House | Carried over to April 14, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 12, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Second reading. |
2021-04-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-04-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-26 | House | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |