OR HB3010 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 247, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Chapter 247, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires media production companies seeking reimbursement under Oregon Production Investment Fund programs to perform certain actions related to diversity, equity and inclusion with respect to production for which reimbursement is sought. Requires media production companies seeking reimbursement under Oregon Production Investment Fund programs to perform certain actions related to diversity, equity and inclusion with respect to production for which reimbursement is sought.
Title
Relating to diversity in media production in Oregon.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | House | Chapter 247, (2021 Laws): Effective date January 01, 2022. |
2021-06-11 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 3--Heard, Kennemer, Thatcher. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | First reading. Referred to President's desk. |
2021-04-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 38; Nays, 8--Breese-Iverson, Cate, Leif, Lewis, Post, Reschke, Stark, Wright; Excused, 14--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Bynum, Clem, Grayber, Hayden, Levy, Nearman, Owens, Pham, Reynolds, Wallan, Williams, Zika. |
2021-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-08 | House | Carried over to April 9, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 8, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-06 | House | Carried over to April 7, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 6, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-04-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to April 5, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-03-31 | House | Carried over to April 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-03-30 | House | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-03-11 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-02-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-01-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |