OR HB3623 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 694, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-02 - Chapter 694, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Deschutes Basin ground water study area; and declaring an emergency.
Title
Relating to the Deschutes Basin ground water study area; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | Chapter 694, (2011 Laws): Effective date August 2, 2011. | |
2011-08-02 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | President signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-24 | Third reading. Carried by Dingfelder. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Atkinson, Boquist, Starr. | |
2011-06-23 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-23 | Recommendation: Do pass the B-Eng. bill. | |
2011-06-22 | Referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-06-22 | First reading. Referred to President's desk. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Whisnant. Passed. Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Beyer. | |
2011-06-21 | Rules suspended. Second reading. | |
2011-06-21 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-15 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-02 | Returned to Full Committee. | |
2011-06-02 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-17 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-05-06 | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Ways and Means by order of Speaker. | |
2011-04-27 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and be referred to Ways and Means. | |
2011-04-21 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-14 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Energy, Environment and Water. | |
2011-04-06 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. |